This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/06/2023 at 01:11:38 (UTC).

MONSCHEIN, GARY VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 MONSCHEIN, GARY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONSCHEIN, GARY

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCULLOUGH, E

MCCULLOUGH, EARL

Defendant Attorneys

WHIPPLE, LIANA

CIELL, KURT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/26/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - ISSUED 1/27/2023

1/26/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - ISSUED 1/27/2023

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023008234

1/26/2023: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023008234

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023008306

1/26/2023: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023008306

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/29/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CERTIFICATE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

2/1/2023: CERTIFICATE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2/6/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

2/6/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

MOTION - DISMISS

2/6/2023: MOTION - DISMISS

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

2/23/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CANC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 06/05/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023008306

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023008234

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - ISSUED 1/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less