This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 21:21:43 (UTC).

MOMZ PROPERTIES VS SIMIC, BRANKO Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 MOMZ PROPERTIES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SIMIC, BRANKO. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDMAN, JUDITH M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOMZ PROPERTIES

Defendants

SIMIC, BRANKO

SIMIC, DARLENE

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT / ORDER - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018157239)

12/3/2018: JUDGMENT / ORDER - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018157239)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/14/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

8/14/2018: ORDER - OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - BRANKO SIMIC

8/9/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - BRANKO SIMIC

SUMMONS NON SERVED-BRANKO SIMIC

7/23/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED-BRANKO SIMIC

SUMMONS NON SERVED-DARLENE SIMIC

7/23/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED-DARLENE SIMIC

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2018074891

7/23/2018: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2018074891

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-DARLENE SIMIC (MAILED TO CHARLOTTE CO SHERIFF)

7/23/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-DARLENE SIMIC (MAILED TO CHARLOTTE CO SHERIFF)

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-BRANKO SIMIC ( MAILED TO CHARLOTTE CO SHERIFF)

7/23/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-BRANKO SIMIC ( MAILED TO CHARLOTTE CO SHERIFF)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/17/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE - CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

7/11/2018: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE - CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM DANA ZIVKOVICH

7/11/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM DANA ZIVKOVICH

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2018064073

6/21/2018: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2018064073

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DARLENE SIMIC - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

6/21/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DARLENE SIMIC - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - BRANKO SIMIC - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

6/21/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - BRANKO SIMIC - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

6/21/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT / ORDER - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018157239)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • HearingTime:09:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BRANKO SIMIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED-BRANKO SIMIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED-DARLENE SIMIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2018074891

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-DARLENE SIMIC (MAILED TO CHARLOTTE CO SHERIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-BRANKO SIMIC ( MAILED TO CHARLOTTE CO SHERIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/14/2018 AT 9:45 AM IN 2B , JDG: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE - CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM DANA ZIVKOVICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$215.00; Amount Paid:$215.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2018064073

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DARLENE SIMIC - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - BRANKO SIMIC - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 07/17/2018 AT 9:45 AM IN 2B , JDG: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less