Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/29/2021 at 18:10:30 (UTC).

MOLINKA, STACIE VS ID8IO LLC

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 MOLINKA, STACIE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ID8IO LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOLINKA, STACIE

MOLINA, STACIE

Defendants

ID8IO LLC

ID8.IO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, SCOTT

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021017884

3/2/2021: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021017884

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- ALIAS - ID8.IO LLC - UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON PREVIOUS SUMMONS

3/2/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- ALIAS - ID8.IO LLC - UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON PREVIOUS SUMMONS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

3/2/2021: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021014968

2/22/2021: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021014968

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

2/10/2021: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ID8.IO

2/10/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ID8.IO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

1/28/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021007916

1/28/2021: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021007916

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021017884

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- ALIAS - ID8.IO LLC - UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON PREVIOUS SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021014968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ID8.IO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 03/02/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$320.00; Amount Paid:$320.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021007916

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK SCOTT W