This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/24/2022 at 19:09:07 (UTC).

MITCHELL, CHRISTINE Et Al VS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 MITCHELL, CHRISTINE filed an Other lawsuit against ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MITCHELL, SCOTT

MITCHELL, CHRISTINE

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALYASNY, MONICA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/29/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PROGRESSIVE ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

11/29/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PROGRESSIVE ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022105063

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022105063

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

12/5/2022: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/9/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM D; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/28/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN D , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022105063

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PROGRESSIVE ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP - ISSUED 12/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALYASNY, MONICA