This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:34:33 (UTC).

MILLER, ZACHARY KEITH VS MILLER, AMY ROSE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 MILLER, ZACHARY KEITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MILLER, AMY ROSE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MILLER, ZACHARY KEITH

Respondent

MILLER, AMY ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

VOGEL, JEANA

Respondent Attorney

KING, AMANDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF - AMY ROSE MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - AMY ROSE MILLER - NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$407.50; Amount Paid:$407.50; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $407.50 RECEIPT #2020075766

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS FAMILY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- AMY ROSE MILLER - ISSUED 9/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - FINANCIAL- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- UCCJEA- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE- AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less