This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 12:02:25 (UTC).

MILLER, SHAWN, MILLER, SHAWN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MILLER, SHAWN, MILLER, SHAWN was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

MILLER, SHAWN

RONAN, JOSEPH MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketACTION: SUBMITTED FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE TO FDLE 30009241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2019007001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketREPORT - NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT - NAME CHANGE -RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019007696)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 22 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2018125344

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - SHAWN MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM FAMILY CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2018118940

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FORM A - SHAWN MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less