This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 18:33:36 (UTC).

MILKS, DEBRA VS OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 MILKS, DEBRA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GALEN, PHYLLIS R and BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILKS, DEBRA

Defendant

OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTSTEIN, JONATHAN ISAAC

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/5/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

5/5/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

5/5/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022040767

5/5/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022040767

SUMMONS SERVED - OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

5/21/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022040767

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 5/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Security Insuance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac