This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 03:22:11 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SCHMITT, DAVID

Case Summary

On 02/12/2014 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCHMITT, DAVID. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDMAN, JUDITH M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SCHMITT, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNN, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/12/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID SCHMITT - ISSUED 2/12/2014

2/12/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID SCHMITT - ISSUED 2/12/2014

COMPLAINT

2/12/2014: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014017199

2/12/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014017199

SUMMONS SERVED-DAVID SCHMITT- SUB SERVED- CHRIS SCHMITT

2/27/2014: SUMMONS SERVED-DAVID SCHMITT- SUB SERVED- CHRIS SCHMITT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/15/2014: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT -DAVID SCHMITT

10/15/2014: MOTION FOR DEFAULT -DAVID SCHMITT

DEFAULT PROPOSED

10/15/2014: DEFAULT PROPOSED

AFFIDAVIT-COSTS

10/15/2014: AFFIDAVIT-COSTS

AFFIDAVIT- NON-MILITARY

10/15/2014: AFFIDAVIT- NON-MILITARY

AFFIDAVIT - KORY HOLST

10/15/2014: AFFIDAVIT - KORY HOLST

DEFAULT -DAVID SCHMITT

10/16/2014: DEFAULT -DAVID SCHMITT

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014132891)

11/5/2014: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014132891)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014132891)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT -DAVID SCHMITT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - KORY HOLST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- NON-MILITARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT -DAVID SCHMITT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED-DAVID SCHMITT- SUB SERVED- CHRIS SCHMITT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014017199

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID SCHMITT - ISSUED 2/12/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/12/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000800 SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dunn, Robert