This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 15:09:54 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MAGEE, JOE

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAGEE, JOE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MAGEE, JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION - FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT

1/28/2019: SATISFACTION - FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT

SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

4/19/2018: SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME

4/18/2018: NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT

4/3/2018: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT

FIRST NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

3/20/2018: FIRST NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018020472

2/27/2018: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018020472

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

6/22/2017: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

SUMMONS SERVED - JOE MAGEE

3/23/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - JOE MAGEE

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOE MAGEE - ISSUED 3/2/2017

3/2/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOE MAGEE - ISSUED 3/2/2017

WRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

2/27/2018: WRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF TAYLOR MADISON

6/22/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF TAYLOR MADISON

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

6/22/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

6/22/2017: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT - JOE MAGEE

5/25/2017: DEFAULT - JOE MAGEE

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

5/24/2017: NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOE MAGEE

5/24/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOE MAGEE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017021364

3/2/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017021364

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

3/2/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION - FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - GARNISHMENT & ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS - Recorded (OR. / 2018150337)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT & DISBURSE FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SERVED - SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED- SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION - GARNISHEE - MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - JOE MAGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOE MAGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JOE MAGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017021364

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOE MAGEE - ISSUED 3/2/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less