This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 03:25:19 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS HOOTEN, JOHN

Case Summary

On 02/12/2014 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOOTEN, JOHN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HOOTEN, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNN, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/12/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN HOOTEN - ISSUED 2/12/2014

2/12/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN HOOTEN - ISSUED 2/12/2014

COMPLAINT

2/12/2014: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014017196

2/12/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014017196

SUMMONS SERVED- JOHN HOOTEN

3/3/2014: SUMMONS SERVED- JOHN HOOTEN

AFFIDAVIT COSTS

5/27/2014: AFFIDAVIT COSTS

AFFIDAVIT -EMILY WALKER

5/27/2014: AFFIDAVIT -EMILY WALKER

AFFIDAVIT- NON-MILITARY

5/27/2014: AFFIDAVIT- NON-MILITARY

NOTICE-FILING - DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - AFFIDAVITS

5/27/2014: NOTICE-FILING - DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - AFFIDAVITS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOHN HOOTEN

5/27/2014: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOHN HOOTEN

DEFAULT PROPOSECD

5/27/2014: DEFAULT PROPOSECD

DEFAULT ENTERED - JOHN HOOTEN

5/28/2014: DEFAULT ENTERED - JOHN HOOTEN

JUDGMENT - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2014065996)

6/5/2014: JUDGMENT - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2014065996)

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

3/5/2020: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

WRIT PROPOSED - OF GARNISHMENT

3/5/2020: WRIT PROPOSED - OF GARNISHMENT

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020024464

3/5/2020: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020024464

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED- TRUST BANK MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020024464

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT PROPOSED - OF GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2014065996)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED - JOHN HOOTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT PROPOSECD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOHN HOOTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-FILING - DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - AFFIDAVITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- NON-MILITARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT -EMILY WALKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED- JOHN HOOTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014017196

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN HOOTEN - ISSUED 2/12/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/12/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000803 NC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dunn, Robert