This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 11/06/2021 at 18:45:18 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS KROUSE, MIKE

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KROUSE, MIKE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

KROUSE, MIKE

Sarasota, FL 34240-9313

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - MIKE KROUSE

10/27/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - MIKE KROUSE

NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

10/14/2021: NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021087518

10/13/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021087518

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

10/13/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MIKE KROUSE

10/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MIKE KROUSE

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

10/13/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/13/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MIKE KROUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021087518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MIKE KROUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 11/23/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E