This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/25/2022 at 02:56:04 (UTC).

MCKILLOP LAW FIRM PL VS DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2007-1 Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 MCKILLOP LAW FIRM PL filed an Other lawsuit against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2007-1. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCKILLOP LAW FIRM PL

Defendants

FORMAN, STEPHEN J

FORMAN, BEVERLY T

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2007-1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKILLOP, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STEPHEN J FORMAN

11/23/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STEPHEN J FORMAN

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEVERLY T FORMAN

11/23/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEVERLY T FORMAN

COMPLAINT

11/23/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - STEPHEN J FORMAN

11/23/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - STEPHEN J FORMAN

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - BEVERLY T FORMAN

11/23/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - BEVERLY T FORMAN

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2007-1

11/23/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2007-1

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021099589

11/23/2021: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021099589

NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

11/24/2021: NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/1/2021: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/26/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021099589

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEVERLY T FORMAN - ISSUED - 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STEPHEN J FORMAN - ISSUED - 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2007-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - BEVERLY T FORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - STEPHEN J FORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKILLOP, DANIEL