This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/21/2020 at 18:31:33 (UTC).

MCATEE, REBEKAH VS RIOS, JORDAN

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 MCATEE, REBEKAH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against RIOS, JORDAN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCATEE, REBEKAH

Respondent

RIOS, JORDAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingTime:08:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketORDER TEMPORARY INJUNCTION DISMISSED OR DISSOLVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCHECKLIST INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SERVED - JORDAN RIOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING RETURNED - SERVED - JORDAN RIOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketACTION: PETITIONER PACKET HAND DELIVERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 6 2020 8:30AM JUDGE: RUHL, MARIA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketACTION: PACKET TO SSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION SSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORDER - ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - INFORMATION FOR RESPONDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE RELATIONSHIP FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less