Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/18/2021 at 18:36:15 (UTC).

MARTINO, LUCIA VS ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 MARTINO, LUCIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINO, LUCIA

Defendants

PLATTNER, DOUGLAS

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK INC

PLATTNER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC

ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUTLER, JESSE

 

Court Documents

MOTION - TO DISMISS

4/16/2021: MOTION - TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/16/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

4/16/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS SERVED - WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

4/7/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED - DOUGLAS D PLATTNER

4/1/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - DOUGLAS D PLATTNER

SUMMONS SERVED - PLATTNER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC

4/1/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - PLATTNER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC

SUMMONS SERVED - ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK INC

4/1/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK INC

PAYMENT $340.00 RECEIPT #2021026117

3/25/2021: PAYMENT $340.00 RECEIPT #2021026117

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

3/25/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WESTERN SURETY COMPANY - ISSUED 03/26/2021

3/25/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WESTERN SURETY COMPANY - ISSUED 03/26/2021

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DOUGLAS D PLATTNER DBA ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK - ISSUED 03/26/2021

3/25/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DOUGLAS D PLATTNER DBA ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK - ISSUED 03/26/2021

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PLATTNER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC - ISSUED 03/26/2021

3/25/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PLATTNER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC - ISSUED 03/26/2021

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK INC - ISSUED 03/26/2021

3/25/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK INC - ISSUED 03/26/2021

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DOUGLAS D PLATTNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - PLATTNER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$340.00; Amount Paid:$340.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $340.00 RECEIPT #2021026117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WESTERN SURETY COMPANY - ISSUED 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DOUGLAS D PLATTNER DBA ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK - ISSUED 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PLATTNER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC - ISSUED 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARCADIA CHEVROLET BUICK INC - ISSUED 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLATTNER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, JESSE