This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/24/2023 at 18:05:35 (UTC).

MANLEY, TERRENCE VS HOVERZON LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 MANLEY, TERRENCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against HOVERZON LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANLEY, TERRENCE

Defendants

RENT A CENTER EAST INC

HOVERZON LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATTERSON, MARK

WEBER, BRANDEN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023017211

2/23/2023: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023017211

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/27/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

4/6/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

4/6/2023: NOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 07/10/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023017211

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less