This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/22/2022 at 18:02:50 (UTC).

MANCUSO, MICHAEL V VS DALTON, ALYSSA A

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 MANCUSO, MICHAEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VS DALTON, ALYSSA A. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANCUSO, MICHAEL V

Defendant

DALTON, ALYSSA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENYON, AMY

Defendant Attorney

KEMP, TRAVIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/21/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALYSSA A DALTON

1/21/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALYSSA A DALTON

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

1/21/2022: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022006245

1/21/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022006245

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/24/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS SERVED - ALYSSA A DALTON

2/27/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - ALYSSA A DALTON

CERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE

3/3/2022: CERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE

ANSWER - ALYSSA A DALTON

3/7/2022: ANSWER - ALYSSA A DALTON

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

3/7/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3/7/2022: RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3/7/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

3/7/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

3/7/2022: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - ALYSSA A DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ALYSSA A DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 06/10/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: MCHUGH, ANDREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022006245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALYSSA A DALTON - ISSUED 1/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAVIS D KEMP