This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 03:58:52 (UTC).

MACLACHLAN, LISA HAMLIN VS MACLACHLAN, FRANK

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 MACLACHLAN, LISA HAMLIN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MACLACHLAN, FRANK. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MACLACHLAN, LISA HAMLIN

Respondent

MACLACHLAN, FRANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018118712)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCHECKLIST INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING RETURNED - SERVED - FRANK MACLACHLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketACTION: PETITIONER PACKET HAND DELIVERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 5 2018 11:00AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketACTION:PACKET TO SSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketORDER - ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION - SSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketWAIVER - PETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - INFORMATION FOR RESPONDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE RELATIONSHIP FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less