This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/16/2020 at 02:32:44 (UTC).

MACK, LAWRENCE ANTHONY VS MACK, SCHELLY ANN

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 MACK, LAWRENCE ANTHONY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MACK, SCHELLY ANN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MACK, LAWRENCE ANTHONY

Respondent

MACK, SCHELLY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TORNESE, LAWRENCE COSMO

Respondent Attorney

COYNE, WHITNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2018116863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION -RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018148956)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • HearingTime:01:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM K; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketREPORT - MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketINDIGENCY APPLICATION APPROVED - SCHELLY ANN MACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2018077499

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018027482

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS FAMILY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SCHELLY ANN MACK - ISSUED 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$773.00; Amount Paid:$773.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $397.50 RECEIPT #2018013097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE-STANDING FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOUTH COUNTY ORIGIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less