This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 11/22/2022 at 18:08:51 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SELBY, RONNIE

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SELBY, RONNIE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SELBY, RONNIE

Venice, FL 34292-3821

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES, MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

RICHARDS, J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

9/23/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

9/23/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

9/23/2022: NOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - RONNIE SELBY

9/23/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - RONNIE SELBY

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

9/23/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022086902

9/23/2022: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022086902

SUMMONS SERVED - RONNIE SELBY

10/7/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - RONNIE SELBY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

10/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

10/26/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM F; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 12/21/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN F , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM F; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - RONNIE SELBY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500; Total Fee: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022086902

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - RONNIE SELBY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 10/26/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN F , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARDS, J