Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 16:32:23 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS GOODING, BRENDA

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOODING, BRENDA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GOODING, BRENDA

North Port, FL 34291-5915

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - BRENDA GOODING

4/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - BRENDA GOODING

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021031073

4/9/2021: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021031073

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

4/9/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

4/9/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/9/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - BRENDA GOODING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/12/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021031073

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL