This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 08:20:56 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BOZENA MAZEWSKA A/K/A BOZENA OLKOWSKA-MAZEWS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2014 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BOZENA MAZEWSKA A/K/A BOZENA OLKOWSKA-MAZEWS. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BOZENA MAZEWSKA A/K/A BOZENA OLKOWSKA-MAZEWS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY

Defendant Attorneys

KERR, ROBERT

BERGES, OTTO

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014023169

2/26/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014023169

RECEIPT # 2015067741 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

2/15/2019: RECEIPT # 2015067741 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

1/7/2016: ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER - GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

10/22/2015: ORDER - GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

6/12/2015: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ORDER - LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING - CASE SHALL REMAIN OPEN 120 DAYS

6/23/2020: ORDER - LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING - CASE SHALL REMAIN OPEN 120 DAYS

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

6/11/2015: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

RECEIPT - OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

5/8/2020: RECEIPT - OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

NOTICE - NO ACTION

2/16/2016: NOTICE - NO ACTION

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING - CASE SHALL REMAIN OPEN 120 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - BOZENA MAZEWSKA A/K/A BOZENA OLKOWSKA MAZEWS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - BOZENA MAZEWSKA A/K/A BOZENA OLKOWSKA-MAZEWS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2015055778

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ALIAS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BOZENA MAZEWSKA AKA BOZENA OLKOWSKA-MAZEWS - ISSUED 5/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - BOZENA MAZEWSKA AKA BOZENA OLKOWSKA-MAZEWS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$520.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$100.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014023169

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BOZENA MAZEWSKA AKA BOZENA OLKOWSKA MAZEWS- ISSUED 2/26/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY KAHN