This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/29/2023 at 01:10:26 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BERRYMAN, ABIGAIL

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BERRYMAN, ABIGAIL. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BERRYMAN, ABIGAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASIN, HUNTER

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/28/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023018404

2/27/2023: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023018404

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

2/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

SUMMONS NON SERVED - ABIGAIL BERRYMAN

2/22/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - ABIGAIL BERRYMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ABIGAIL BERRYMAN

1/25/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ABIGAIL BERRYMAN

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

1/24/2023: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/24/2023: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

1/24/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

1/24/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

4/26/2023: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PLURIES

4/26/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PLURIES

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023040702

4/25/2023: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023040702

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

4/25/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

4/25/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS NON SERVED - ABIGAIL BERRYMAN

4/21/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - ABIGAIL BERRYMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - AMENDED

4/21/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PLURIES

3/29/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PLURIES

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

3/28/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS; Court Result: CANC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS; Court Result: CNCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PLURIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/23/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: COUNTY CIVIL C AND D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023040702

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - ABIGAIL BERRYMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023007301

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less