This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/09/2022 at 18:06:17 (UTC).

LOWE, JACOB T VS LOWE, MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 LOWE, JACOB T filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOWE, MICHELLE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOWE, JACOB T

Respondent

LOWE, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RIBEL, ZACHARY

Respondent Attorney

POOLE, KENNETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingTime:08:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE - ISSUANCE SUBPOENAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketORDER - PERMITTING WIFE TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - KENNETH M POOLE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - KENNETH M POOLE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketORDER - ON STIPULATION FOR SOCIAL INVESTIGATION AND/OR TO APPOINT EVALUATOR TO COMPLETE PARENTING PLAN RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATION - FOR SOCIAL INVESTIGATION AND/OR TO APPOINT EVALUATOR TO COMPLETE PARENTING PLAN RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - JACOB T LOWE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMOTION - FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET - BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POOLE, KENNETH