This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 05:20:37 (UTC).

LOGAN, CAROLYN VS JOHNS, JEANETTE

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 LOGAN, CAROLYN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHNS, JEANETTE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOGAN, CAROLYN

Defendant

JOHNS, JEANETTE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

12/31/2018: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

12/31/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

INDIGENCY APPLICATION APPROVED

12/31/2018: INDIGENCY APPLICATION APPROVED

SUMMONS SERVED - JEANETTE JOHNS

1/7/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - JEANETTE JOHNS

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

3/5/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

MAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

3/11/2020: MAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

4/17/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

MAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

4/27/2020: MAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

8/6/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

11/4/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020155832)

11/5/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020155832)

MAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

11/30/2020: MAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020155832)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:CONT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 11/04/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:Continued Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 08/12/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - JEANETTE JOHNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 05/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JEANETTE JOHNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$195.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$195.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY APPLICATION APPROVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-JEANETTE JOHNS-HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less