This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/19/2022 at 18:23:31 (UTC).

LINETSKY, YURY VS COMCAST CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 LINETSKY, YURY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COMCAST CORPORATION. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINETSKY, YURY

Defendant

COMCAST CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COMCAST CORPORATION - CERTIFIED MAIL(7018 0360 0001 4935 6058)

1/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COMCAST CORPORATION - CERTIFIED MAIL(7018 0360 0001 4935 6058)

PAYMENT $96.11 RECEIPT #2022005180

1/19/2022: PAYMENT $96.11 RECEIPT #2022005180

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

1/19/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

RECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL - COMCAST CORPORATION COMCAST CENTER

1/21/2022: RECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL - COMCAST CORPORATION COMCAST CENTER

NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

1/24/2022: NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

RECEIPT - COMCAST CORPORATION

2/7/2022: RECEIPT - COMCAST CORPORATION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/8/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022023263)

2/10/2022: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022023263)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022023263)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - COMCAST CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL - COMCAST CORPORATION COMCAST CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$96.11; Amount Paid:$96.11; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $96.11 RECEIPT #2022005180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COMCAST CORPORATION - CERTIFIED MAIL(7018 0360 0001 4935 6058)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 02/08/2022 AT 2:00 PM IN 2 , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant