This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 05:22:52 (UTC).

LEVINS, KATHLEEN M Et Al VS PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 LEVINS, KATHLEEN M filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEVINS, WILLIAM

LEVINS, KATHLEEN M

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSS, VANESSA

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, SCOTT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

2/8/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

ADDRESS CHANGE

12/7/2018: ADDRESS CHANGE

REPORT - MEDIATOR

12/4/2018: REPORT - MEDIATOR

DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

11/9/2018: DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

11/6/2018: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

ANSWER -- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANT

10/24/2018: ANSWER -- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/15/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018094391

9/17/2018: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018094391

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 09/17/2018

9/17/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 09/17/2018

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - TO DEFENDANT

9/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - FIRST REQUEST TO DEFENDANT

9/17/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - FIRST REQUEST TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

9/17/2018: NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE - PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

9/17/2018: NOTICE - PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - OF THE PLAINTIFFS WILLIAM LEVINS AND KATHLEEN M LEVINS

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - OF THE PLAINTIFFS WILLIAM LEVINS AND KATHLEEN M LEVINS

COMPLAINT

9/17/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/17/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDRESS CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT - MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER -- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018094391

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 09/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - FIRST REQUEST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - OF THE PLAINTIFFS WILLIAM LEVINS AND KATHLEEN M LEVINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less