This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 08:43:29 (UTC).

LAMBERT, LOUISE M, MARTIN, NANCY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 LAMBERT, LOUISE M, MARTIN, NANCY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARROLL, HUNTER W and WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARROLL, HUNTER W

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Decedent

LAMBERT, LOUISE M

Applicant

MARTIN, NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MCPEEK, ALAN BRENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCONSENT - JOINDER WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCONSENT - JOINDER WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - SARASOTA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE - FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021065552

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCPEEK, ALAN BRENT