This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 22:44:28 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS CIPRIANI AT VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CIPRIANI AT VENETIAN GOLF RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUHL, MARIA and WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUHL, MARIA

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

QUICKEN LOANS INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

KENSORA, KEVIN T

CIPRIANI AT VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

WCI COMMUNITIES INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

KENSORA, SHERRY R

VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB MASTER ASSOCIATION INC N/K/A VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TRAVIESO, JENNIFER

LEWIS, MICHELLE

Defendant Attorneys

ROWE, MICHELLE

GUARDADO, ASTRID

MEADOWS, CAROLYN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - QUICKEN LOANS INC; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR QUICKEN LOANS INC - Recorded (OR. / 2020008854)

1/20/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - QUICKEN LOANS INC; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR QUICKEN LOANS INC - Recorded (OR. / 2020008854)

ORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE SUMMONS

12/30/2019: ORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE SUMMONS

MOTION - EXPEDITE FORECLOSURE

5/15/2019: MOTION - EXPEDITE FORECLOSURE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CIPRIANI AT VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION IN

9/12/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CIPRIANI AT VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION IN

DEFAULT - PROPOSED

7/30/2018: DEFAULT - PROPOSED

NOTICE OF NO ACTION

3/12/2018: NOTICE OF NO ACTION

SUMMONS SERVED - VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB MASTER ASSOCIATION INC NKA VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

1/26/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB MASTER ASSOCIATION INC NKA VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS SERVED - WCI COMMUNITIES INC

1/19/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - WCI COMMUNITIES INC

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SHERRY R KENSORA - ISSUED 01/05/2018

1/4/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SHERRY R KENSORA - ISSUED 01/05/2018

RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT - AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONS

12/10/2019: RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT - AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONS

DEFAULT - PROPOSED

9/12/2018: DEFAULT - PROPOSED

SUMMONS SERVED - CIPRIANI AT VENICE GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION IN

9/7/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - CIPRIANI AT VENICE GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION IN

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - VENETIAN GOLF

8/16/2018: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - VENETIAN GOLF

ANSWER - KEVIN T KENSORA

8/9/2018: ANSWER - KEVIN T KENSORA

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

2/28/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS SERVED - CIPRIANI AT VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

1/31/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - CIPRIANI AT VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018004992

1/16/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018004992

COMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

1/4/2018: COMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - QUICKEN LOANS INC; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR QUICKEN LOANS INC - Recorded (OR. / 2020008854)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - VACATE DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT QUICKEN LOANS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020005613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE QUICKEN LOANS INC - ISSUED 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT - AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 1; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Dec 9 2019 10:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN TENANT 2 - ISSUED 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE- PARTY DOES NOT MATCH CASESTYLE- VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB MASTER ASSOCIATION INC NKA VENETIAN GO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE- PARTY DOES NOT MATCH CASESTYLE- CIPRIANI AT VENETIAN GOLF & RIVER CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018002220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less