This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 02:20:05 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ESTATE OF DONALD L DAVID WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ESTATE OF DONALD L DAVID WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUHL, MARIA and WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUHL, MARIA

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

PELICAN POINTE GOLF COUNTRY CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA JANE HAGAUER AKA JANE HAGAUER AKA LINDA JANE WILLEY AKA LINDA JANE GAMBRILL

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SUSAN C COTE AKA SUSAN CAROL COTE AKA SUSAN C DAVID AKA SUSAN LUTE

LINDA JANE HAGAUER AKA JANE HAGAUER AKA LINDA JANE WILLEY AKA LINDA JANE GAMBRILL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY MCCLUSKEY AKA NANCY BETH MCCLUSKEY AKA BETH JOHNSON AKA NANCY BETH DAVID

NANCY MCCLUSKEY AKA NANCY BETH MCCLUSKEY AKA NANCY BETH JOHNSON AKA NANCY BETH DAVID

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ESTATE OF DONALD L DAVID WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SUSAN C COTE AKA SUSAN CAROL COTE AKA SUSAN C DAVID AKA SUSAN LUTE

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

DAVID, DONALD L

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONALD L DAVID

THE SANCTUARY AT PELICAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUMMEL, BRIAN

MORTON, MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

HOROWITZ, GREGG MARTIN

GREGG M. HOROWITZ PA

RUDY, JOHN FORNEY III

ROWE, MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

MOTION - TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

6/10/2019: MOTION - TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

SUMMONS NON SERVED - ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ESTATE OF DONALD L DAVID WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

5/3/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ESTATE OF DONALD L DAVID WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SUSAN C COTE A/K/A SUSAN CAROL COTE A/K/A SUSAN C DAVID A/K/A SUSAN LUTE

5/2/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SUSAN C COTE A/K/A SUSAN CAROL COTE A/K/A SUSAN C DAVID A/K/A SUSAN LUTE

SUMMONS SERVED - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

4/19/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

3/27/2018: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY MCCLUSKEY AKA NANCY BETH MCCLUSKEY AKA BETH JOHNSON AKA NANCY BETH DAVID - ISSUED 03/26/2018

3/26/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY MCCLUSKEY AKA NANCY BETH MCCLUSKEY AKA BETH JOHNSON AKA NANCY BETH DAVID - ISSUED 03/26/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DONALD L. DAVID

8/31/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DONALD L. DAVID

PAYMENT $1,975.00 RECEIPT #2017058638

6/16/2017: PAYMENT $1,975.00 RECEIPT #2017058638

NOTICE- FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMESTEADS

6/15/2017: NOTICE- FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMESTEADS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/5/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

9/12/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/11/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING - CROSS

7/22/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - CROSS

MOTION - FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS PROCEEDS

7/12/2019: MOTION - FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS PROCEEDS

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/9/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION - AMENDED - TO DISTRIBUTE SURPLUS FUNDS - THE SANCTUARY AT PELICAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

6/28/2019: MOTION - AMENDED - TO DISTRIBUTE SURPLUS FUNDS - THE SANCTUARY AT PELICAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MOTION - FOR DISTRIBUTION

6/27/2019: MOTION - FOR DISTRIBUTION

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE "REOPENED" FILE

6/18/2019: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE "REOPENED" FILE

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ENFORCING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - TIME SPENT ENFORCING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 5 2020 1:30PM JUDGE: RUHL, MARIA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT - REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Dec 4 2019 9:30AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
148 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMESTEADS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017075694)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less