This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 13:43:20 (UTC).

KURNOT, STACY VS CAREY CONSTRUCTION, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 KURNOT, STACY filed an Other lawsuit against CAREY CONSTRUCTION, LLC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KURNOT, STACY

Defendants

SCOTT, LACEY M

HOROWITZ, ARRIAN M

CAREY CONSTRUCTION, LLC

CAREY, MICHAEL C

GOLD COAST EAGLE DISTRIBUTING LLLP

HOROWITZ, GREGG M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAPIRO, M DAVID

FERNANDEZ, STEPHEN

SHAPIRO, M

Defendant Attorneys

PRESTON, DAVID

MARASCO, SCOTT

HAMILTON, WILLIAM SCOTT

HAMILTON, W

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY - ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

2/5/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY - ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

2/5/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC FROM ATTORNEY

12/21/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC FROM ATTORNEY

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

12/21/2018: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

REPORT - MEDIATION

12/17/2018: REPORT - MEDIATION

CERTIFICATE - OF AUTHORITY - MEDIATION

12/13/2018: CERTIFICATE - OF AUTHORITY - MEDIATION

CERTIFICATE- OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION CONFERENCE

12/12/2018: CERTIFICATE- OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF HOROWITZ DEFENDANTS ONLY

11/28/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF HOROWITZ DEFENDANTS ONLY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/19/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PROPOUDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GREGG M HOROWITZ

10/4/2017: NOTICE OF PROPOUDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GREGG M HOROWITZ

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ARRIAN M HOROWITZ

10/4/2017: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ARRIAN M HOROWITZ

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/4/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/4/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/4/2017: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/4/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/4/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/4/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/4/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY - ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF AUTHORITY - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF HOROWITZ DEFENDANTS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017093574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GREGG M HOROWITZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ARRIAN M HOROWITZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less