This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2021 at 01:39:53 (UTC).

KRINSK, SARA E VS PLYMOUTH HARBOR INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 08/29/2014 KRINSK, SARA E filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PLYMOUTH HARBOR INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRINSK, SARA E

Defendant

PLYMOUTH HARBOR INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRISON, R CRAIG

Defendant Attorneys

CAZIN, CHRISTOPHER

DIAZ, ERIN

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014098574

8/29/2014: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014098574

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF VIDEO DEPOSITION

10/9/2015: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF VIDEO DEPOSITION

COMPLAINT

8/29/2014: COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFFS PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE REQUEST

11/19/2014: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFFS PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE REQUEST

NOTICE-PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

5/7/2015: NOTICE-PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO THE PLAINTIFF

10/15/2014: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO THE PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

10/15/2014: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

DEFENDANT PLYMOUTH HARBOR INCORPORATED - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURTS ORDER DATED MAY 28 2015 AS TO RAC MATERIALS AND INCIDENT REPORTS

6/18/2015: DEFENDANT PLYMOUTH HARBOR INCORPORATED - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURTS ORDER DATED MAY 28 2015 AS TO RAC MATERIALS AND INCIDENT REPORTS

PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT

2/20/2015: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2016
  • HearingTime:02:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 12 2016 2:30PM JUDGE: CURLEY, ROCHELLE LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 12 2016 2:30PM JUDGE: CURLEY, ROCHELLE LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRESENTATION OF EXCEPTIONS TO COURT ORDER ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTAL RECOMMENDED ORDER BY MAGISTRATE DEBORAH A BAILEY IN ACCORDANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF PROCEDURE 1.490(I), ET. SEQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM 1; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
163 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014098574

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PLYMOUTH HARBOR INCORPORATED- ISSUED 8/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT M TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT L TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS F THROUGH K TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS A THROUGH E TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLYMOUTH HARBOR INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAZIN , CHRISTOPHER ALBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIN M DIAZ, ESQ