This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/23/2022 at 18:34:17 (UTC).

KIRKPATRICK, RAYMOND Et Al VS MORAN, IDA J Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 KIRKPATRICK, RAYMOND filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORAN, IDA J. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIRKPATRICK, RAYMOND

KIRKPATRICK, SHIELA

Defendants

MORAN, MICHAEL P

MORAN, IDA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESSLER, BRYAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - IDA J MORGAN - ISSUED 11/29/2022

11/28/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - IDA J MORGAN - ISSUED 11/29/2022

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL P MORAN - ISSUED 11/29/2022

11/28/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL P MORAN - ISSUED 11/29/2022

COMPLAINT

11/28/2022: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022105058

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022105058

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/5/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS SERVED - MICHAEL P MORAN

12/12/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - MICHAEL P MORAN

SUMMONS SERVED - IDA J MORAN - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

12/12/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - IDA J MORAN - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM D; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - IDA J MORAN - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MICHAEL P MORAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/28/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN D , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $420.00; Amount Paid: $420.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022105058

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL P MORAN - ISSUED 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - IDA J MORGAN - ISSUED 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KESSLER, BRYAN