This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 11:39:36 (UTC).

KIMBIS, DANA A Et Al VS KIMBIS JR, NICHOLAS PETER

Case Summary

On 03/27/2018 KIMBIS, DANA A filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against KIMBIS JR, NICHOLAS PETER. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KIMBIS, DANA A

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Respondent

KIMBIS JR, NICHOLAS PETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

TORNESE, LAWRENCE COSMO

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION SHEET-SUPPORT - CONNECTICUT - FILED IN OPEN COURT

5/17/2019: INFORMATION SHEET-SUPPORT - CONNECTICUT - FILED IN OPEN COURT

PAYMENT HISTORY

5/17/2019: PAYMENT HISTORY

NOTICE OF TERMINATION IV-D SERVICES

4/29/2019: NOTICE OF TERMINATION IV-D SERVICES

REQUEST FORM C

3/25/2019: REQUEST FORM C

PAYMENT MEMORANDUM

3/8/2019: PAYMENT MEMORANDUM

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/22/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER - ON STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW

7/30/2018: ORDER - ON STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FOR RESPONDENT

4/10/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FOR RESPONDENT

CERTIFIED STATEMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT BALANCE

3/27/2018: CERTIFIED STATEMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT BALANCE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - SUPPORT

5/22/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - SUPPORT

MOTION - SUPPORT - TO DISMISS FOREIGN ORDER

3/25/2019: MOTION - SUPPORT - TO DISMISS FOREIGN ORDER

RECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL

3/29/2018: RECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/28/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER - CERTIFIED 7001 2510 0001 1570 4705

3/28/2018: NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER - CERTIFIED 7001 2510 0001 1570 4705

ORDER - SUPPORT - CONNECTICUT

3/27/2018: ORDER - SUPPORT - CONNECTICUT

PETITION - TRANSMITTAL #1

3/27/2018: PETITION - TRANSMITTAL #1

INFORMATION SHEET-SUPPORT - DEMOGRAPHIC

3/27/2018: INFORMATION SHEET-SUPPORT - DEMOGRAPHIC

CIVIL COVER SHEET - REQUEST TO REGISTER SUPPORT ORDER

3/27/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - REQUEST TO REGISTER SUPPORT ORDER

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM - SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUPPORT - CLOSING CASE AND ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM I; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET-SUPPORT - CONNECTICUT - FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUESTIONNAIRE SUPPORT- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TERMINATION IV-D SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 17 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: DEMEDIO, GLORIA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER - CERTIFIED 7001 2510 0001 1570 4705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT BALANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUPPORT - CONNECTICUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - TRANSMITTAL #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET-SUPPORT - DEMOGRAPHIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - REQUEST TO REGISTER SUPPORT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less