Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 22:30:04 (UTC).

KEYBANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO FIRST NIAGAR BANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO NEW ALLIANCE BANK VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHE

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 KEYBANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO FIRST NIAGAR BANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO NEW ALLIANCE BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT S WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARROLL, HUNTER W and MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARROLL, HUNTER W

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEYBANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO FIRST NIAGAR BANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO NEW ALLIANCE BANK

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY #1 NKA MICHAEL BOLAN

DEFREEST, PHILLIP L

UNKNOWN PARTY #4

UNKNOWN PARTY #2 NKA HEATHER OLSON

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

DEFREEST, PHILLIP

DEFREEST, KATHLEEN

UNKNOWN PARTY #3

THE ESTATE OF GEORGE A POTTER

PAMELA S TRAUTMAN AKA PAMELA S POTTER

POTTER, NANCY A

POTTER JR, GEORGE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ACEVEDO, ARIEL

LINDHARDT, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

FRANCE, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/24/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE - OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

6/12/2018: NOTICE - OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

5/4/2018: RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY

11/1/2017: NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/21/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS

4/20/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1 NKA MICHAEL BOLAN

3/24/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1 NKA MICHAEL BOLAN

NOTICE OF VALUE

2/27/2017: NOTICE OF VALUE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/27/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/19/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE - OF SERVICE OF ORDER

6/5/2020: NOTICE - OF SERVICE OF ORDER

ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

5/15/2020: ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

COMPLAINT - AMENDED

4/1/2020: COMPLAINT - AMENDED

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

3/25/2020: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

NOTICE OF HEARING

1/24/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER - JUDICIAL SALES - ON PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND CANCEL THE FORECLOSURE SALE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019136401)

10/2/2019: ORDER - JUDICIAL SALES - ON PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND CANCEL THE FORECLOSURE SALE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019136401)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/2/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE - DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR

7/17/2019: NOTICE - DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • HearingTime:08:25 AM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • HearingTime:08:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • HearingTime:08:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jun 19 2020 8:15AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jun 19 2020 8:25AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVICE OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING CLERK TO UPDATE CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jun 19 2020 8:15AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PHILLIP L DEFREEST AKA PHILLIP DEFREEST- ISSUED 2/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY # 1- ISSUED 2/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY #2- ISSUED 2/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017024040)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES 702.015(4)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KeyBank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCE, MICHAEL