This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/19/2022 at 15:59:34 (UTC).

KAY JEWELERS Et Al VS HOOGLAND, BRANDON

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 KAY JEWELERS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOOGLAND, BRANDON. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAY JEWELERS

STERLING JEWELERS INC

Defendant

HOOGLAND, BRANDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON WRIT - CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

6/19/2020: ORDER ON WRIT - CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

WRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

6/12/2020: WRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

6/19/2020: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

WRIT RETURNED - NON SERVED - BADGER BOBS SERVICES INC

7/16/2020: WRIT RETURNED - NON SERVED - BADGER BOBS SERVICES INC

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

6/12/2020: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020048465

6/12/2020: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020048465

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

3/31/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-BRANDON HOOGLAND

4/3/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-BRANDON HOOGLAND

FACT INFORMATION SHEET

7/7/2017: FACT INFORMATION SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - NON SERVED - BADGER BOBS SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED- BADGER BOBS SERVICES INC MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON WRIT - CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketACTION: FWD CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND TRANSMITTAL LETTER TO JUDGE'S OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020048465

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM RAUSCH STRUM ISRAEL ENERSON & HORNIK, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $395.00; Amount Paid: $395.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: GARNISHMENT FILING FEE - COUNTY; Total Fee: $85.00; Amount Paid: $85.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY SUBMITTED EFILE & ISSUED; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017032555

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-BRANDON HOOGLAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/23/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B , JDG: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STERLING JEWELERS INC DBA JARED THE GALLERIA OF JEWELRY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C