This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 18:12:02 (UTC).

K & D MILLWORKS INC VS POIRIER, DENISE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 K D MILLWORKS INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against POIRIER, DENISE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K & D MILLWORKS INC

Defendants

POIRIER, ROBERT

POIRIER, DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAULKNER, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $563.22 RECEIPT #2022098177

11/4/2022: PAYMENT $563.22 RECEIPT #2022098177

NOTICE OF RECORDING - ROBERT POIRIER - CERTIFIED MAIL (#7021 0350 0000 2752 3418)

11/4/2022: NOTICE OF RECORDING - ROBERT POIRIER - CERTIFIED MAIL (#7021 0350 0000 2752 3418)

NOTICE OF RECORDING - DENISE POIRIER - CERTIFIED MAIL (7021 0350 0000 2752 3401)

11/4/2022: NOTICE OF RECORDING - DENISE POIRIER - CERTIFIED MAIL (7021 0350 0000 2752 3401)

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022172259)

11/4/2022: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022172259)

RECEIPT - CERTIFIED - DENISE POIRIER

11/7/2022: RECEIPT - CERTIFIED - DENISE POIRIER

RECEIPT - CERTIFIED - ROBERT POIRIER

11/7/2022: RECEIPT - CERTIFIED - ROBERT POIRIER

RECEIPT - RETURN - ROBERT POIRIER

11/9/2022: RECEIPT - RETURN - ROBERT POIRIER

RECEIPT - CERTIFIED - DENISE POIRIER

11/10/2022: RECEIPT - CERTIFIED - DENISE POIRIER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - CERTIFIED - DENISE POIRIER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - RETURN - ROBERT POIRIER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - CERTIFIED - ROBERT POIRIER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - CERTIFIED - DENISE POIRIER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $570.22; Amount Paid: $563.22; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS IN EXCESS OF FIVE @ $2.50 PER DEFENDANT; Total Fee: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: RECORDING FEE ADDITIONAL PAGES; Total Fee: $85.00; Amount Paid: $85.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CERTIFIED MAIL; Total Fee: $12.22; Amount Paid: $12.22; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: RECORDING FEE $10 FIRST PAGE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: RECORDING ADDITIONAL PARTY OVER 4; Total Fee: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CLERK FEE - ISSUANCE OF EXECUTION ON FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Total Fee: $42.00; Amount Paid: $42.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: JUDGMENT - FOREIGN FILED AND RECORDED; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS IN EXCESS OF FIVE @ $2.50 PER DEFENDANT; Total Fee: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK; Total Fee: $7.00; Amount Paid: $7.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK; Total Fee: $7.00; Amount Paid: $7.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK; Total Fee: $7.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022172259)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING - DENISE POIRIER - CERTIFIED MAIL (7021 0350 0000 2752 3401)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING - ROBERT POIRIER - CERTIFIED MAIL (#7021 0350 0000 2752 3418)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $563.22 RECEIPT #2022098177

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less