Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 03/13/2021 at 19:14:37 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BILLINGS, PENNY Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BILLINGS, PENNY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

PENNY R BILLINGS AKA PENNY BILLINGS, SURVIVING SPOUSE OF ROBERT L BILLINGS, JR., DECEASED

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PENNY R BILLINGS

SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

IBERIABANK

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

BILLINGS, PENNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

Defendant Attorneys

ROWE, MICHELLE

CAMPBELL, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017087924)

7/13/2017: JUDGMENT - IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017087924)

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

6/28/2017: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

10/31/2016: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

10/27/2016: NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

SUMMONS NON SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

10/3/2016: SUMMONS NON SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PENNY R BILLINGS AKA PENNY BILLINGS SURVIVING SPOUSE OF ROBERT L BILLINGS JR DECEASED - ISSUED 09/07/2016

9/6/2016: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PENNY R BILLINGS AKA PENNY BILLINGS SURVIVING SPOUSE OF ROBERT L BILLINGS JR DECEASED - ISSUED 09/07/2016

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 09/07/2016

9/6/2016: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 09/07/2016

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSIN OF ORIGINAL NOTE

9/6/2016: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSIN OF ORIGINAL NOTE

NOTICE- VALUE

9/6/2016: NOTICE- VALUE

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

8/17/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2012-9.1

6/28/2017: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2012-9.1

AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

5/22/2017: AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/12/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

10/3/2016: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

SUMMONS SERVED - SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

10/3/2016: SUMMONS SERVED - SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS SERVED - IBERIA BANK

10/3/2016: SUMMONS SERVED - IBERIA BANK

PAYMENT $1,965.00 RECEIPT #2016091873

9/7/2016: PAYMENT $1,965.00 RECEIPT #2016091873

FORECLOSURE FORM B

9/6/2016: FORECLOSURE FORM B

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017109218)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2017076362

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED FOR SALE ON 8/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 09/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 09/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- IBERIABANK - ISSUED 09/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSIN OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016111170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where IBERIABANK is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELISSA ANNE CAMPBELL