Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 17:37:39 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2017 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY

KLEIN, MARGIE SUE

KERKERING BARBERIO CO

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARGIE SUE SMITH AKA MARGIE S SMITH AKA MARGIE SUE KLEIN

SMITH, MARGIE SUE

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY

SMITH, MARGIE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

Defendant Attorney

PADEREWSKI, ALEXANDER GEORGE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017081044)

6/28/2017: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017081044)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

6/28/2017: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

4/5/2017: NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

3/22/2017: CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KERKERING BARBERIO & CO F/K/A KERKERING BARBERIO & CO PA

3/20/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KERKERING BARBERIO & CO F/K/A KERKERING BARBERIO & CO PA

DEFENDANT MARGIE SUE SMITHS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT

3/16/2017: DEFENDANT MARGIE SUE SMITHS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT

SUMMONS NON SERVED SUPPORT - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

3/9/2017: SUMMONS NON SERVED SUPPORT - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

SUMMONS SERVED SUPPORT - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

3/9/2017: SUMMONS SERVED SUPPORT - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY

3/9/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 - ISSUED 02/15/2017

2/15/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 - ISSUED 02/15/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KERKERING BARBERIO & CO FKA KERKERING BARBERIO & CO PA - ISSUED 02/15/2017

2/15/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KERKERING BARBERIO & CO FKA KERKERING BARBERIO & CO PA - ISSUED 02/15/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- MARGIE SUE SMITH AKA MARGIE S SMITH AKA MARGIE SUE KLEIN - ISSUED 02/15/2017

2/15/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- MARGIE SUE SMITH AKA MARGIE S SMITH AKA MARGIE SUE KLEIN - ISSUED 02/15/2017

FORECLOSURE FORM B

2/15/2017: FORECLOSURE FORM B

FORECLOSURE FORM A

2/15/2017: FORECLOSURE FORM A

COMPLAINT FORECLS $50,000 OR LESS

2/15/2017: COMPLAINT FORECLS $50,000 OR LESS

NOTICE- VALUE

2/15/2017: NOTICE- VALUE

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017019185)

2/15/2017: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017019185)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/15/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017081044)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT KERKERING BARBERIO & CO F/K/A KERKERING BARBERIO & CO PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT MARGIE SUE SMITHS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED SUPPORT - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED SUPPORT - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - KERKERING BARBERIO & CO FKA KERKERING BARBERIO & CO PA

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARGIE SUE SMITH AKA MARGIE S SMITH AKA MARGIE SUE KLEIN - ISSUED 02/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 - ISSUED 02/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KERKERING BARBERIO & CO FKA KERKERING BARBERIO & CO PA - ISSUED 02/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- MARGIE SUE SMITH AKA MARGIE S SMITH AKA MARGIE SUE KLEIN - ISSUED 02/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS $50,000 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017019185)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERKERING BARBERIO & CO is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REV is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant