This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 18:39:19 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA VS VOSS, RYAN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VOSS, RYAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

Defendant

VOSS, RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1/21/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006216

1/22/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006216

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RYAN VOSS - ISSUED - 1/22/2021

1/21/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RYAN VOSS - ISSUED - 1/22/2021

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/21/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/21/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RYAN VOSS - ISSUED - 1/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.