This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/02/2023 at 18:04:47 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA VS SERVAES, JAMES

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SERVAES, JAMES. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

Defendant

SERVAES, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREU, JUAN

PALMA, JORGE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

2/1/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JAMES SERVAES- ISSUED 02/02/2023

2/1/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JAMES SERVAES- ISSUED 02/02/2023

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/1/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010078

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010078

SUMMONS SERVED - JAMES SERVAES

2/14/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - JAMES SERVAES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JAMES SERVAES

3/21/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JAMES SERVAES

DEFAULT - PROPOSED

3/21/2023: DEFAULT - PROPOSED

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

3/21/2023: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

DEFAULT - JAMES SERVAES

3/22/2023: DEFAULT - JAMES SERVAES

NOTICE OF FILING

3/27/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - JAMES SERVAES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JAMES SERVAES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JAMES SERVAES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023010078

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JAMES SERVAES- ISSUED 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less