This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 18:31:27 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA VS SALERNO, NICHOLAS J

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SALERNO, NICHOLAS J. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

Defendant

SALERNO, NICHOLAS J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAVRAR, FLYNN

KLEIN, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1/21/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006222

1/22/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006222

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

1/22/2021: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

DOCKET LINE USED IN ERROR - ERROR WITH FORM

1/22/2021: DOCKET LINE USED IN ERROR - ERROR WITH FORM

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-NICHOLAS J SALERNO - ISSUED 01/22/2021

1/21/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-NICHOLAS J SALERNO - ISSUED 01/22/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/21/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021006222

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-NICHOLAS J SALERNO - ISSUED 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER KLEIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.