This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 10/26/2022 at 18:41:25 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA VS ANDRESS, WILLIAM R

Case Summary

On 10/01/2022 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANDRESS, WILLIAM R. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

Defendant

ANDRESS, WILLIAM R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREU, JUAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

9/29/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WILLIAM R ANDRESS

9/29/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WILLIAM R ANDRESS

NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

9/29/2022: NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087595

10/1/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087595

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087595

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WILLIAM R ANDRESS- ISSUED 10/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREU , JUAN G