This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/24/2022 at 19:16:27 (UTC).

JONES, KAITLYN Et Al VS PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 JONES, KAITLYN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES, KAITLYN

JONES, RYAN

Defendant

PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANGELONE, ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

GREENBERG, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

11/28/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

11/28/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/28/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/28/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/28/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/28/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

11/28/2022: NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022105089

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022105089

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND EMAIL DESIGNATIONS

12/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND EMAIL DESIGNATIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND EMAIL DESIGNATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022105089

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peoples Trust Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greenberg, Michael