Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 17:15:44 (UTC).

JM WORTHINGTON LP VS BRALY, BATE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2017 JM WORTHINGTON LP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRALY, BATE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JM WORTHINGTON LP

Defendants

FLEISCHER, ESTHER L

FLEISCHER, SAM

GARRISON, ROBERT L

MARTIN, HG

MARTIN, EMMA LENA

THOMPSON, MABEL H

FLEISHCHER, ESTHER

GARRISON, GERTRUDE L

BRALY, JANET R

BRALY, BATE

BRALY, JANET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, SCOTT

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/17/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF ACTION

4/24/2017: NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY FOR GERTRUDE L GARRISON

4/20/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY FOR GERTRUDE L GARRISON

NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED - UNABLE TO ISSUE - DEFENDANTS GERTRUDE L GARRISON AND ROBERT GARRISON NAMED IN NOTICE OF ACTION AND COMPLAINT DO NOT MATCH AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

4/11/2017: NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED - UNABLE TO ISSUE - DEFENDANTS GERTRUDE L GARRISON AND ROBERT GARRISON NAMED IN NOTICE OF ACTION AND COMPLAINT DO NOT MATCH AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUITY FOR ESTHER L FLEISHER AKA ESTER FLEISHER

4/11/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUITY FOR ESTHER L FLEISHER AKA ESTER FLEISHER

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR MABEL H THOMPSON

4/4/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR MABEL H THOMPSON

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017020664

3/1/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017020664

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017014992

2/14/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017014992

COMPLAINT TO REFORM DEEDS AND QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY

2/14/2017: COMPLAINT TO REFORM DEEDS AND QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES P. HARVEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/21/2017: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES P. HARVEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

5/12/2017: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

4/20/2017: NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUITY FOR GERTRUDE L GARRISON AKA GERTRUDE GARRISON

4/11/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUITY FOR GERTRUDE L GARRISON AKA GERTRUDE GARRISON

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR GERTRUDE GARRISON

4/4/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR GERTRUDE GARRISON

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR EMMA LENA MARTIN

4/4/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR EMMA LENA MARTIN

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR BATE BRALY

4/4/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR BATE BRALY

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR ESTHER FLEISCHER

4/4/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR ESTHER FLEISCHER

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR SAM FLEISCHER

4/4/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR SAM FLEISCHER

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017092123)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES P. HARVEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 17 2017 10:00AM JUDGE: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketACTION: NOTICE OF ACTION SENT TO NEWSPAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR ESTHER FLEISCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR SAM FLEISCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR MABEL H THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017020664

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017015067

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT # 2017014992 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017014992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO REFORM DEEDS AND QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK SCOTT W