This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/15/2021 at 10:11:17 (UTC).

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC VS SHOCK, KATHLEEN

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHOCK, KATHLEEN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC

Defendant

SHOCK, KATHLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, ASHLEY

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018142089)

10/29/2018: DEFAULT JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018142089)

MOTION - FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

10/23/2018: MOTION - FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT - AUTHORIZED AGENT

10/23/2018: AFFIDAVIT - AUTHORIZED AGENT

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

10/23/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

9/20/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

9/20/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

DEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

9/14/2018: DEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

9/13/2018: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

9/13/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

SUMMONS SERVED - KATHLEEN SHOCK

7/2/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - KATHLEEN SHOCK

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018056317

5/31/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018056317

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KATHLEEN SHOCK- ISSUED 5/30/2018

5/30/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KATHLEEN SHOCK- ISSUED 5/30/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

5/30/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018142089)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - AUTHORIZED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketACTION: DEFAULT ENTERED ON KATHLEEN SHOCK 9/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - KATHLEEN SHOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - KATHLEEN SHOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018056317

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KATHLEEN SHOCK- ISSUED 5/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less