This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 15:58:30 (UTC).

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC VS KLEMENTOWSKI, BRIAN

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KLEMENTOWSKI, BRIAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC

Defendant

KLEMENTOWSKI, BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORR, DAVID

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019068124)

5/22/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019068124)

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

5/17/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT AND BILL OF SALE

5/17/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT AND BILL OF SALE

INFORMATION SHEET

5/17/2019: INFORMATION SHEET

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

5/17/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT - AS TO COURT COSTS

5/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT - AS TO COURT COSTS

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

5/17/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

DEFAULT - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

1/29/2018: DEFAULT - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

1/26/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT - PROPOSED

1/26/2018: DEFAULT - PROPOSED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

1/26/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

SUMMONS SERVED - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

11/29/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017099346

10/23/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017099346

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/23/2017: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI-ISSUED 10/23/2017

10/23/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI-ISSUED 10/23/2017

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

10/23/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/23/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019068124)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT AND BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - AS TO COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017099346

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BRIAN KLEMENTOWSKI-ISSUED 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less