Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/07/2021 at 12:40:22 (UTC).

JAMES B NUTTER COMPANY VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 JAMES B NUTTER COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES B NUTTER COMPANY

Defendants

DIBITETTO, JOHN B

MICHAEL JOHN DIBITETTO AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE DIBITETTO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 5 1999

SOUTH VENICE CIVIC ASSOCIATION INC

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN B DIBITETTO NKA CHRISTINE DIBITETTO

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL JOHN DIBITETTO

JOHN B DIBITETTO AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE DIBITETTO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 5 1999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWARTZ, SEAN

Defendant Attorneys

CEMOVICH, ROBERT

RUDY, JOHN FORNEY III

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018080946)

6/18/2018: DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018080946)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

6/18/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE FOR TRIAL

5/25/2018: NOTICE FOR TRIAL

DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL JOHN DI BITETTO

5/16/2018: DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL JOHN DI BITETTO

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

5/15/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

DEFAULT - PROPOSED

5/15/2018: DEFAULT - PROPOSED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL JOHN DI BITETTO

5/15/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL JOHN DI BITETTO

DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN B DI BITETTO N/K/A CHRISTINE DIBITETTO - SOUTH VENICE CIVIC ASSOCIATION INC

4/23/2018: DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN B DI BITETTO N/K/A CHRISTINE DIBITETTO - SOUTH VENICE CIVIC ASSOCIATION INC

AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS

4/20/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL JOHN DIBITETTO AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE DIBITETTO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 5 1999 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

1/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL JOHN DIBITETTO AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE DIBITETTO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 5 1999 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL JOHN DIBITETTO - ISSUED 01/31/2017

1/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL JOHN DIBITETTO - ISSUED 01/31/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN B DIBITETTO AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE DIBITETTO FAMILY REVCOCABLE TURST DATED MARCH 5 1999 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

1/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN B DIBITETTO AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE DIBITETTO FAMILY REVCOCABLE TURST DATED MARCH 5 1999 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN B DIBITETTO - ISSUED 01/31/2017

1/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN B DIBITETTO - ISSUED 01/31/2017

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702 015 A CERTIFICATION

1/31/2017: NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702 015 A CERTIFICATION

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017012357)

1/31/2017: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017012357)

NOTICE - VALUE

1/31/2017: NOTICE - VALUE

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

1/31/2017: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/31/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018080946)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL JOHN DI BITETTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL JOHN DI BITETTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN B DI BITETTO N/K/A CHRISTINE DIBITETTO - SOUTH VENICE CIVIC ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketACTION: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL JOHN DI BITETTO N/K/A JEAN DIBITETTO - NAME ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT DOES NOT MATCH PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SOUTH VENICE CIVIC ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL JOHN DIBITETTO AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE DIBITETTO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 5 1999 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL JOHN DIBITETTO - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN B DIBITETTO AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE DIBITETTO FAMILY REVCOCABLE TURST DATED MARCH 5 1999 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN B DIBITETTO - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702 015 A CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017012357)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH VENICE CIVIC ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where James B Nutter & Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Swartz, Sean Matthew