This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 06:12:56 (UTC).

IDEAL DEALS LLC VS TOPPS FENCE INC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 IDEAL DEALS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TOPPS FENCE INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IDEAL DEALS LLC

Defendant

TOPPS FENCE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOWDEN, JESSIE

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018152440)

11/20/2018: JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018152440)

NOTICE - SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE

10/11/2018: NOTICE - SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES

8/21/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES

AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES

8/6/2018: AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/13/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS SERVED - NITISHA F HARRIS

9/12/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - NITISHA F HARRIS

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM BOWDEN BARLOW LAW PA TO CLERK

9/12/2017: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM BOWDEN BARLOW LAW PA TO CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- TOPPS FENCE INC

8/18/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- TOPPS FENCE INC

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

7/25/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

REQUEST - BOWDEN BARLOW LAW PA

10/10/2018: REQUEST - BOWDEN BARLOW LAW PA

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

11/30/2017: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

AFFIDAVIT - INTEREST

11/30/2017: AFFIDAVIT - INTEREST

AFFIDAVIT

11/28/2017: AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS SERVED - TOPPS FENCE INC

9/12/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - TOPPS FENCE INC

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017071625

7/26/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017071625

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

7/25/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - TOPPS FENCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • HearingTime:03:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:Cancelled Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018152440)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - BOWDEN BARLOW LAW PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 11/28/2018 AT 3:30 PM IN H , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - TOPPS FENCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - NITISHA F HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM BOWDEN BARLOW LAW PA TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- TOPPS FENCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 09/13/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN H , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017071625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less