This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/06/2023 at 01:21:34 (UTC).

HOLMES, FRIDA VS ALLAN, KAITLYN ELIZABETH Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 HOLMES, FRIDA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALLAN, KAITLYN ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLMES, FRIDA

Defendants

ALLAN, KAITLYN ELIZABETH

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINEBLOOM, DARREN

Defendant Attorney

GUBERNAT, JESSE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KAITLYN ELIZABETH ALLAN

2/23/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KAITLYN ELIZABETH ALLAN

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

2/23/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/23/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023017159

2/23/2023: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023017159

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

3/1/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

4/3/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 06/05/2023 AT 2:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $420.00; Amount Paid: $420.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023017159

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - ISSUED 2/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KAITLYN ELIZABETH ALLAN - ISSUED 2/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less