This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/09/2020 at 21:01:59 (UTC).

HOERCHER, DONALD F, HOERCHER, MARION B Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 HOERCHER, DONALD F, HOERCHER, MARION B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Applicants

HOERCHER, DONALD F

HOERCHER, SUSAN J

Decedent

HOERCHER, MARION B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

BOWMAN, ALICE SCHOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketWILL ADMITTED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020137400)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (BOND APPROVED 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketBOND - APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020075801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketORDER-PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less